# Balbharati Solutions Class 5 Mathematics Multiplication and Division

## Balbharati Solutions Class 5 Mathematics Multiplication and Division

Welcome to NCTB Solutions. Here with this post we are going to help 5th class students for the Solutions of Balbharati Class 5 Math Book, Problem Set 14, 15 and 16, Multiplication and Division. Here students can easily find step by step solutions of all the problems for Multiplication and Division. Also our Expert Mathematic Teacher’s solved all the problems with easily understandable methods with proper guidance so that all the students can understand easily. Here in this post students will get Multiplication and Division solutions. Here all the solutions are based on Maharashtra State Board latest syllabus.

Multiplication and Division all Question Solutions :

Problem Set 14 :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(1) 327 × 92

= 30084

(2) 807 × 126

= 101682

(3) 567 × 890

= 504630

(4) 4317 × 824

= 3557208

(5) 6092 × 203

= 1236676

(6) 1177 × 99

= 116523

(7) 456 × 187

= 85272

(8) 6543 × 79

= 516897

(9) 2306 × 832

= 1918592

(10) 6429 × 509

= 3272361

(11) 4,321 × 678

= 2929638

(12) 20,304 × 87

= 1766448

Question no – (2)

Solution :

Given, Student = 745

Paper bags = 25

= 745 × 25 = 18625

745 Students made 18626 paper bags.

Question no – (3)

Solution :

In one row medical trees = 215

Rows of trees = 132

= (215 × 132)

= 28380

Thus, 28380 saplings are there in the plantation altogether.

Question no – (4)

Solution :

One computer cost = 27540 rupees

Computer = 18

= (27540 × 18)

= 495720

Hence, 18 computer cost 495720 rupees.

Question no – (5)

Solution :

Per student = 5000

Students = 154

= (5000 × 154)

= 770000

Therefor, the total 770000 rupees granted to that taluka.

Question no – (6)

Solution :

Two-wheeler costs = 53,670

Two-wheelers = 35

= (53670 × 35)

= 1878450

Therefore, 35 such two-wheelers costs 1878450.

Question no – (7)

Solution :

One hour = 3,600 seconds

For 360 hours,

= (3600 × 360)

= 1296000

Hence, 1296000 seconds in 360 hours.

Question no – (8)

Solution :

Mobile cost = 5473

Mobiles = 627

= (5473 × 627)

= 3431571

Thus, 627 mobiles will costs 3431671.

Question no – (9)

Solution :

As we know that,

Biggest three-digit number is 999

Biggest four-digit number is 9999

Hence, (9999 ×999)

= 9989001

Therefore, The product of the biggest three-digit number and the biggest four-digit number is 9989001

Question no – (10)

Solution :

One traveller = 7650 rupees

Traveller = 36

For 26 travellers

= (7650 × 36)

= 275400

Therefore, For 26 travellers cost 275400 rupees.

Problem Set 15 :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(1) 1284 ÷ 32 = 40

After divide 1284 by 32 we got the result,

Quotient is 40

Remainder is 4

(2) 5586 ÷ 87 = 64

After divide 5586 by 87 we got the result,

Quotient is 64

Remainder is 18

(3) 1207 ÷ 27 = 44

After divide 1207 by 27 we got the result,

Quotient is 44

Remainder is 19

(4) 8543 ÷ 41 = 204

After divide 8543 by 41 we got the result,

Quotient is 204

Remainder is 15

(5) 2304 ÷ 43 = 25

After divide 2304 by 43 we got the result,

Remainder is 25

Quotient is 53

(6) 56,741 ÷ 26 = 2182

After divide 56,741 by 26 we got the result,

Quotient is 2182

Remainder is 9

Question no – (2)

Solution :

Travel = 336 km

Speed = 48 km per hour

We know,

Time = Distance ÷ Speed

= 336 ÷ 48

= 7

Therefore, 7 hours it take to travel 336 km at a speed of 48 km per hour.

Problem Set 16 :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

Total = 10000 rupees

Anna donated = 7,000 rupees

We know, Remaining amount = Total amount – Anna donate

= (10000 – 7000)

= 3000

Remaining amount is 3000

Amount of each prize,

= 3000 ÷ 6

= 500

Therefore, the amount of each prize will be Rs 500

More Solutions :

👉 Three Dimensional Objects and Nets

👉 Patterns

Updated: July 1, 2023 — 7:48 am