Frank Learning Maths Class 4 Solutions Chapter 5

Frank Learning Maths Class 4 Solutions Chapter 5 Multiplication

Welcome to NCTB Solutions. Here with this post we are going to help 4th class students for the Solutions of Frank Learning Maths Class 4 Math Book, Chapter 5, Multiplication. Here students can easily find step by step solutions of all the problems for Multiplication, Exercise 5.1, 5.2, 5.3, 5.4, 5.5, 5.6, 5.7 and 5.8 Also here our mathematics teacher’s are solved all the problems with easily understandable methods with proper guidance so that all the students can understand easily.

Multiplication Exercise 5.1 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 75 × 8

= 600

(b) 97 × 9

= 873

(c) 167 × 3

= 501

(d) 235 × 7

= 1645

(e) 462 × 4

= 1848

(f) 1222 × 8

= 9776

(g) 2336 × 3

= 7008

(h) 3743 × 3

= 11229

(i) 4673 × 2

= 9346

(j) 7138 × 5

= 35690

Multiplication Exercise 5.2 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 56 × 0 = 0

(b) 87965 × 1 = 87965

(c) 45000 × 1 = 45000

(d) 24 × 0 × 45 = 0

(e) 11 × 2 × 4 = 11 × 2 × 4 = 88

(f) 850 × 8 = 8 × 850

(g) 87 × 1 × 3 = 261 = 87 × 1 × 3

(h) 600 × 3 = 3 × 600

Question no – (5)

Solution :

(a) 25 × 10 = 250

(b) 54 × 10 = 540

(c) 60 × 60 = 3600

(d) 40 × 800 = 32000

(e) 8 × 2000 = 16000

(f) 8 × 5000 = 40,000

(g) 30 × 400 = 12000

(h) 200 × 100 = 20,000

(i) 987 × 100 = 98700

(j) 743 × 1000 = 7,43,000

Multiplication Exercise 5.3 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 176

× 29
———————
1584

352 ×
———————
5104

(b) 273

× 28
———————
2184

546 ×
———————
7644

(c) 937

× 12
———————
1874

937 ×
———————
11,244

(d) 878

× 56
———————
5268

4390 ×
———————
49168

(e) 564

× 25
———————
2820

1128 ×
———————
14100

(f) 674

× 33
———————

2022

2022 ×
———————
22242

(g) 2345

× 27
———————
16415

4690 ×
———————
63315

(h) 2585

× 26
———————
15510

5170 ×
———————
67210

(i) 4896

× 18
———————
39168

4896 ×
———————
88228

(j) 3278

× 23
———————
9834

6556 ×
———————
75394

(k)

5243

× 19
———————
47187

5243 ×
———————
99617

(l) 7613

× 14
———————
30452

7613 ×
———————
106582

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 208

× 23
———————
624

416 ×
———————
4784

(b) 705

× 38
———————
5640

2115 ×
———————
26,790

(c) 2309

× 16
———————
13854

2309 ×
———————
37944

(d) 3006

× 25
———————
15030

6012 ×
———————
75150

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a)

 TTh Th H T O 4 7 9 × 6 2 9 5 8 + 2 8 7 4 × 2 9 6 9 8

(b)

 L TTh Th H T O 2 8 6 3 × 9 8 2 2 9 0 4 + 2 5 7 6 7 × 2 8 0 5 7 4

Multiplication Exercise 5.4 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 467

× 161
————————-
467

2802 ×

467 ×
————————-
75187

(b) 761

× 139
————————-
6849

2283 ×

761 ×
————————-
105779

(c) 510

× 106
————————-
3060

000 ×

510 ×
————————-
54060

(d) 528

× 698
————————-
4224

4752 ×

3168 ×
————————-
368544

(e) 3074

× 189
————————-
27666

24592 ×

3074 ×
————————-
580986

(f) 1429

× 303
————————-
4287

0000 ×

4287 ×
————————-
432987

(g) 2009

× 156
————————-
12054

10045 ×

2009 ×
————————-
313404

(h) 1232

× 540
————————-
0000

4928 ×

6160 ×
————————-
665280

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 407

× 112
————————-
814

407 ×

407 ×
————————-
45,584

(b) 373

× 425
————————-
1865

746 ×

1492 ×
————————-
158525

(c) 1710

× 217
————————-
11970

1710 ×

3420 ×
————————-
371070

(d) 1065

× 115
————————-
5325

1065 ×

1005 ×
————————-
122475

Multiplication Exercise 5.5 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

Cost of 75 books = 125 × 75

= Rs. 9375

Question no – (2)

Solution :

Money collected = 15 × 347

= Rs 5205

Question no – (4)

Solution :

Total flowers packed

= 350 × 121

= 42,350

Question no – (5)

Solution :

February = 28 day

= 28 × 24 hour

= 28 × 24 × 60 minute

= 40,320 minute

Question no – (6)

Solution :

Total no of cards = 52 × 483

= 25116 cards

Question no – (7)

Solution :

Total passengers carried by bus = 164 × 355

= 59,860

Question no – (8)

Solution :

234 km = 234 × 1000 meter

= 2,34,000 meter

Question no – (9)

Solution :

No. of sheets

= 2874 × 144

= 4,13,856

Question no – (10)

Solution :

Cost of 104 CD player

= 104 × 2405

= Rs 2,50,120

Question no – (11)

Solution :

Total no. of toffees

= 317 × 650

= 2,06,050

Question no – (12)

Solution :

Total weight of the books

= 314 × 163

= 51,182 kg

Multiplication Exercise 5.6 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) A book cost 67 Rupee. How much will 15 books cost?

(b) A mobile cover cost 112. What will be the cost of 54 such off covers.

(c) Alipurduar to Delhi fare is ₹ 1024.

So, How much the fare of 75 passengers.

(d) In a book shop, a shelf contains 836 books. How many books contain 245 shelf’s?

Multiplication Exercise 5.7 Solution :

Question no – (3)

Solution :

Total weight of such bags –

375

× 99
———————

3375

3375 ×
———————
37125 kg

So, Total weight 37000 kg approximately.

Question no – (4)

Solution :

Cost of 9 bikes,

= 56,875 × 9

= 5,11,875 Rs

Therefore, the total cost will be 5,12,000 Rs

Next Chapter Solution :

Updated: June 12, 2023 — 3:03 pm