**Rd Sharma Solutions Class 7 Chapter 3 Decimals**

Welcome to NCTB Solution. Here with this post we are going to help 7th class students for the Solutions of Rd Sharma Class 7 Mathematics, Chapter 3, Decimals. Here students can easily find Exercise wise solution for chapter 3, Decimals. Students will find proper solutions for Exercise 3.1, 3.2 and 3.3. Our teachers solved every problem with easily understandable methods so that every students can understand easily. Here all solutions are based on the CBSE latest curriculum.

**Decimals Exercise 3.1 Solution**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(i) 8/100**

= 0.08

**∴** As decimal = 0.08

**(ii) 20 + 9/10 + 4/100**

= 20 + 0.9 + 0.04

= 20.94

**∴** As decimal = 20.94

**(iii) 23 + 2/10 + 6/1000**

= 23 + 0.2 + 0.006

= 23.206

**∴** As decimal = 23.206

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 0.04**

= 4/100

= 1/25

**(ii) 2.34**

= 234/100

= 117/50

**(iii) 0.342**

= 342/1000

= 171/500

**(iv) 17.38**

= 1738/100

= 869/50

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 23/10**

= 2.3

**(ii) 25 1/8**

= 25 + 1/8

= 25 + 0.125

= 25.125

**(iii) 39 7/35**

= 39.2

**(iv) 15 1/25**

= 15.04

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 41.8,39.24, 5.01 and 62.6**

= (41.8 + 39.24 + 5.01 + 62.6)

= 148.65

For more better understanding :

**(ii) 18.03, 146.3, 0.829 and 5.324**

= (18.03 + 146.3 + 0.829 + 5.324)

= 170.483

**For more better understanding :**

**(5) Find the value of.**

**Solution :**

**(i) 9.756 – 6.28**

= 3.476

**For more better understanding :**

**(ii) 48.1 – 0.37**

= 47.73

**For more better understanding :**

**(iii) 108.032 – 86.8**

= 21.232

**For more better understanding :**

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

As per the question,

= 3.547 from 7.2

= (7.200 – 3.547)

= 3.653

Therefore, the answer will be 3.653

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution : **

According to the question,

= 36.85 and 59.41

= (59.41 – 36.85)

= 22.56

Hence, 22.56 should be added.

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution :**

According to the question,

= 34.79 and 70.15?

= (70.15 – 34.79)

= 35.36

Thus, 35.36 Should be increased.

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution :**

As per the given question,

= 17.1 and 2.051

= (17.1 – 2.051)

= 15.049

Therefore, 15.049 should be subtracted.

**Question no – (10)**

**Solution :**

In the given question,

= 59.71 and 34.58

= (59.71 – 34.58)

= 25.13

Therefore, 25.13 is decreased to get 34.58.

**Decimals Exercise 3.2 Solution**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 4.74 × 10**

= 47.4

Thus, the product will be 47.4

**(ii) 0.45× 10**

= 4.6

Therefore, the product will be 4.6

**(iii) 0.0215 × 10**

= 0.215

Thus, the product will be 0.215

**(iv) 0.0054 × 10**

= 0.054

Hence, the product will be 0.054

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 35.853 × 100**

= 3585.3

Hence, the product will be 3585.3

**(ii) 42.5 × 100**

= 4250

Thus, the product will be 4250

**(iii) 12.075 × 100**

= 1207.5

Therefore, the product will be 1207.5

**(iv) 100 × 0.005**

= 0.5

So, the product will be 0.5

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 2.506 × 1000**

= 2506

Thus, the product is 2506

**(ii) 20.708 × 1000**

= 20708

So, the product is 20708

**(iii) 0.0529 × 1000**

= 52.9

Hence, the product is 52.9

**(iv) 1000 × 0.1**

= 100

Therefore, the product is 100

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 3.4 × 17**

= 57.8

Therefore, the product will be 57.8

**(ii) 0.745 × 12**

= 8.94

Hence, the product will be 8.94

**(iii) 28.73 × 47**

= 1350.31

Thus, the product will be 1350.31

**(iv) 0.0415 × 59**

= 2.448

So, the product will be 2.448.

**Question no – (5) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 1.07 × 0.02**

= 0.021

**∴** The answer is 0.021

**(ii) 211.9 × 1.13**

= 239.44

**∴** The answer is 239.44

**(iii) 10.05 × 1.05**

= 10.552

**∴** The answer is 10.552

**(iv) 13..01 × 5.01**

= 65.1801

**∴** The answer is 65.1801

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution :**

In the question,

Length = 5.5 m

Breadth = 3.4 m

As we know that,

Area of rectangle = Length × Breadth

**∴** Area of rectangle,

= 5.5 × 3.4

= 18.7 sq. m

Therefore, the the area of the rectangle will be 18.7 sq. m.

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution :**

As per the question,

Cost of 1 book is = 25.75

**∴** Cost of 24 books,

= 24 × 25.75

= Rs 618

Therefore, the cost of 24 such books will be Rs 618.

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution :**

According to the question,

Car covers a distance of 14.75 km in one litre of petrol.

It cover in 15.5 litres of petrol = ?

**∴** It will covers,

= 14.75 × 15.5

= 228.62 km

Hence, it will cover 228.62 km in 15.5 litres of petrol.

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution :**

As per the given question,

Cost of one kg rice = 42.65

cost 18.25 kg of rice = ?

**∴** Cost of 18.25 Kg rice,

= 42.65 × 18.25

= 778.3625 Rs.

Hence, the cost of 18.25 Kg rice is Rs. 778.3625.

**Question no – (10)**

**Solution :**

According to the question,

Cost of one metre cloth = 152.50

Cost of 10.75 metres of cloth = ?

**∴** Cost of 10.75 metres,

= 152.50 × 10.75

= 1639.375 Rs.

Therefore, the cost of 10.75 metres of cloth will be Rs 1639.375.

**Decimals Exercise 3.3 Solution**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** Given, 142. 45 by 10

= 14.245

**(ii)** Given,54.25 by 10

= 5.425

**(iii)** Given, 3.45 by 10

= 0.345

**(iv)** Given, 0.57 by 10

= 0.057

**(v)** Given, 0.043 by 10

= 0.0043

**(vi)** Given,0.004 by 10

= 0.0004

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** Given, 459.5 by 100

= 4.595

**(ii)** Given, 74.3 by 100

= 0.743

**(iii)** Given, 5.8 by 100

= 0.058

**(iv)** Given, 0.7 by 100

= 0.0007

**(v)** Given, 0.48 by 100

= 0.0048

**(vi)** Given, 0.03 by 100

= 0.0003

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** As per question, 235.41 by 1000

= 0.235

**(ii)** As per question, 29.5 by 1000

= 0.0295

**(iii)** As per question,3.8 by 1000

= 0.0038

**(iv)** As per question, 0.7 by 1000

= 0.0007

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** 0.45 by 9

= 0.05

**(ii)** 217.44 by 18

= 12.08

**(iii)** 319.2 by 2.28

= 140

**(iv)** 40.32 by 9.6

= 4.2

**(v)** 0.765 by 0.9

= 0.85

**(vi)** 0.768 by 1.6

= 0.48

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution :**

**(i) Given, 16.64 by 20**

= 0.832

**(ii) Given, 0.192 by 12**

= 0.016

**(iii) Given, 163.44 by 24**

= 6.81

**(iv) Given, 403.2 by 96**

= 4.2

**(v) Given, 16.344 by 12**

= 1.362

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution :**

**(i) Given, 15.68 by 20**

= 1568/20 × 100

= 0.784

**(ii) Given, 164.6 by 200**

= 1646/200 × 10

= 0.823

**Question no – (7) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 76 by 0.019**

= 76 × 1000/19

= 4000

**(ii) 88 by 0.08**

= 88 × 100/8

= 1100

**(iii) 148 by 0.074**

= 148 × 1000/74

= 2000

**(iv) 7 by 0.014**

= 7 × 1000/14

= 500

**Question no – (8) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 20 by 50**

= 20/50

= 0.04

**(ii) 8 by 100**

= 8/100

= 0.08

**(iii) 72 by 576**

= 72/576

= 0.125

**(iv) 144 by 15**

= 144/15

= 9.6

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution :**

As per the question,

Vehicle covers 43.2 km = 2.4 litres petrol

Distance cover in 1 litre of petrol = ?

**∴** Distance travel in 1 litre of petrol,

= 43.2/2.4

= 18 km

Therefore, the vehicle cover 18 km in 1 litre of petrol.

**Question no – (10)**

**Solution :**

According to the question,

Weight of some bags wheat = 1743 kg

Weight of one bag = 49.8

**∴** Total bag,

= 1743/49.8

= 1743 × 10/498

= 35

Hence, there are total 35 bags.

**Question no – (11)**

**Solution :**

As per the question,

Total cloth = 50 m

Each piece is 1.25 m

**∴** She will get,

= 50/1.25

= 50 × 100/125

= 400

Therefore, she get 400 pieces.

**Question no – (12)**

**Solution :**

As per the given question,

Side of a rectangular polygon = 2.5 cm

The perimeter of the polygon = 12.5 cm

**∴** No of sides polygon have,

= 12.5 × 10/2.5 × 10

= 5

Thus, the polygon have 5 sides.

**Question no – (13)**

**Solution :**

According to the question,

Product of two decimals = 42.987

one of them = 12.46

**∴** The other decimal is,

= 42.987/12.46

= 42987 × 100/12.46 × 100

= 345/10

= 3.45

Therefore, the other decimal will be 3.45.

**Question no – (14)**

**Solution :**

According to the question,

Weight of 34 bags of sugar = 3483.3 kg

Weight of each bag = ?

**∴** Weigh of each bag,

= 3483.3/34

= 34833/34 × 10

= 1024.5/10

= 102.45 kg

Therefore, the weight of each bag is 102.45 kg.

**Question no – (15)**

**Solution :**

As per the question,

Each bucket has capacity of 8.5 litres.

**∴** Number of bucket,

= 586.5/8.5

= 586/85

= 69

Therefore, 69 buckets of equal capacity can be filled from 586.5 litres of water.

**Next Chapter Solution : **

👉 Chapter 4 👈