**Rd Sharma Solutions Class 6 Chapter 1 Knowing Our Numbers**

Welcome to NCTB Solution. Here with this post we are going to help 6th class students for the Solutions of Rd Sharma Class 6 Mathematics, Chapter 1, Knowing Our Numbers. Here students can easily find Exercise wise solution for chapter 1, Knowing Our Numbers. Students will find proper solutions for Exercise 1.1, 1.2, 1.3, 1.4, 1.5, 1.6, 1.7, 1.8, 1.9 and 1.10. Our teachers solved every problem with easily understandable methods so that every students can understand easily. Here all solutions are based on the CBSE latest curriculum.

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.1 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** Eight thousand twelve

= 8012

**(ii)** Seventy thousand fifty three.

= 70053

**(iii)** Five lakh seven thousand four hundred six

= 5, 07, 406

**(iv)** Six lakh two thousand nine.

= 6, 02, 609

**(v)** Thirty lakh eleven thousand one

= 30, 11, 001

**(vi)** Eight crore four lakh twenty five .

= 8, 04, 00, 025

**(vii)** Three crore three lakh three thousand three hundred three

= 3, 03, 03, 303

**(viii)** Seventeen crore sixty lakh thirty thousand fifty seven

= 17, 60, 30, 057

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** 42, 007

= Forty two thousand seven.

**(ii)** 4, 05, 045

= Four lakh five thousand forty five.

**(iii)** 35, 42, 012

= Thirty five lakh forty two thousand twelve.

**(iv)** 7, 06, 04, 014

= Seven crore six lakh four thousand twelve.

**(v)** 25, 05, 05, 500

= Twenty five crore five lakh five thousand five.

**(vi)** 5, 50, 50, 050

= Five crore fifty lakh fifty thousand fifty.

**(vii)** 5, 03, 04, 012

= Five crore three lakh four thousand twelve.

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution : **

**(i)** 4375

= 4, 375

**(ii)** 24798

= 24, 798

**(iii)** 857367

= 8, 57, 367

**(iv)** 9050784

= 90, 50, 784

**(v)** 10105607

= 1, 01, 05, 607

**(vi)** 10000007

= 1, 00, 00, 07

**(vii)** 910107104

= 91, 01, 07, 104

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution : **

**(i) 3057**

= 3 × 1000 + 5 × 10 + 7 × 1

**(ii) 12345**

= 1× 10000 + 2 × 1000 + 3 × 100 + 4 × 10 + 5 × 1

**(iii) 10205**

= 1 × 10000 + 0 × 1000 + 2 × 100 + 0 × 10 + 5 × 1

**(iv) 235060**

= 2 × 10, 0000 + 3 × 10000 + 5 × 1000 + 0 × 100 + 6 × 10 + 0

**Question no – (5) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** 7 × 10000 + 2 × 1000 + 5 × 100 + 9 × 10 + 6 × 1

= 72, 596

**(ii)** 4 × 100000 + 5 × 1000 + 1 × 100 + 7 × 1

= 4, 05, 107

**(iii)** 8 × 1000000 + 3 × 1000 + 6 × 1

= 80, 03, 006

**(iv)** 5 × 10000000 + 7 × 1000000 + 8 × 1000 + 9 × 10 + 4

= 5, 70, 08, 094

**Question no – (6) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** Given, 74983160

**∴** The value of 4

= (4 × 10, 00, 000)

= 40, 00, 000

**(ii)** Given, 8745836

**∴** The value of 4

= (4 × 10, 000)

= 40, 000

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution :**

Given number,

450758

**∴** Product is,

= (50 × 50, 000)

= 25, 00, 000

So, the product is 25, 00, 000.

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution :**

Given number,

= 257839705

**∴** Difference is,

= (70, 00, 000 – 700)

= 69, 99, 300

Therefore, the difference is 69, 99, 300.

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution :**

Difference of place value,

= (50, 00 – 5)

= 49, 995

Therefore, the face value of 5 is same.

**Question no – (10)**

**Solution :**

In 92078634 the digits 0 and 4 have the same face value and place value.

**Question no – (11)**

**Solution :**

**∴** 4 different 3-digit numbers can be formed by using the digits 0, 2, 5.

The different 3 digit numbers are,

= 205, 250, 502, 520

**Question no – (12)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** When repetition of digits is allowed, all possible 3 digit numbers are,

= 640, 604, 406, 460.

**(ii)** When repetition of digits is allowed, all possible 3 digit numbers are

= 400, 406, 460, 466, 404, 444, 440, 446, 464, 600, 640, 604, 644, 646, 664, 606, 660, 666.

**Question no** – **(13)**

**Solutions** **:**

**(i)** 1 lakh = 10 ten thousand

**(ii)** 1 lakh = 100 thousand

**(iii)** 1 lakh = 1000 Hundred

**(iv)** 1 lakh = 10000 ten

**(v)** 1 crore = 10 ten lakh

**(vi)** 1 crore = 100 Lakh

**(viii)** 1 crore = 1000 Ten Thousand

**(viii)** 1 crore = 10000 Thousand

**(ix)** 1 crore = 100000 hundred

**(x)** 1 crore = 1000000

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.2 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** Seven million three hundred three thousand two hundred six

= 7 × 100000 + 3 × 100000 + 0 × 10000 + 3 × 1000 + 2 × 100 + 0 × 10 + 6 × 1

**(ii)** Fifty five million twenty nine thousand seven.

= 5 × 10000000 + 5 × 1000000 + 0 × 100000 + 2 × 10000 + 9 × 100 + 0 × 100 + 0 × 10 + 7 × 1

**(iii)** Six billion one hundred ten million three thousand seven

= 6 × 100000000 + 1 × 100000000 + 1 × 10000000 + 0 × 1000000 + 0 × 100000 + 0 × 10000 + 3 × 1000 + 0 × 100 + 0 × 10 + 7 × 1

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution : **

**(i) 513625**

= 513, 625

= Five hundred thirteen thousand six hundred twenty five.

**(ii) 4035672**

= 4,035, 672

= Four million thirty five thousand six hundred seventy two

**(iii) 65954923**

= 65,954, 923

= Sixty five million nine hundred fifty four thousand nine hundred twenty three

**(iv) 70902005**

= 70, 902,005

= Seventy million nine hundred two thousand five.

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** Forty three lakh four thousand eighty four.

= Four million three hundred four thousand eighty four

= 4,304,084

**(ii)** Six crore thirty four lakh four thousand forty four

= Sixty three million four hundred four thousand forty four

= 63,404,044

**(iii)** Seven lakh thirty five thousand eight hundred ninety nine only

= Seven hundred thirty five thousand eight hundred ninety nine only

= 735,899

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** Six million five hundred forty three thousand two hundred ten.

= Sixty five lakh forty three thousand two hundred ten

= 65, 43, 210.

**(ii)** Seventy six million eighty five thousand nine hundred eighty seven

= 7, 60, 85, 987

= Seven crore sixty lakh eighty five thousand hundred eighty seven

**(iii)** Three hundred twenty five million four hundred seventy nine thousand eight hundred thirty eight.

= 32, 54, 79, 838

= Thirty two crore fifty four lakh seventy thousand nine thousand eight hundred eight hundred thirty eight.

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution : **

In the Indian system the number is,

Thirty three crore thirty two lakh twenty two thousand eight hundred thirty eight.

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution :**

= 1000 thousands make a million.

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution :**

= 1000 millions make a billion.

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** 10 lakhs make a million.

**(ii)** 10, 000 lakhs make a billion.

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** Eight million seven hundred eight thousand four.

In numeral = 8, 784, 000

**(ii)** Six hundred seven million twelve thousand eighty four.

In numeral = 607, 012, 084

**(iii)** Four billion twenty five million forty five thousand

In numeral = 4, 025, 045, 000

**Question no – (10)**

**Solution : **

**(i) 435, 002**

= Four hundred thirty five thousand two

**(ii) 1, 047, 509**

= One million forty seven thousand five hundred nine.

**(iii) 59, 064, 523**

= Fifty nine million sixty four thousand five hundred twenty three.

**(iv) 25, 201, 905**

= Twenty five million two hundred one thousand nine hundred five.

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.3 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

The number of four digit numbers are,

= 9 × 10 × 10 × 10

= 9000

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution :**

We know,

The Smallest six digit number = 100000

The Largest six digit number = 999999

**∴** Difference,

= (999999 – 100000)

= 899999

Number between these are,

1000000, 999999, 899998

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution :**

The number of 8 digit numbers are,

= 9 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10

= 9000000

Therefore, total 8 digit numbers are 9000000 or Nine crores.

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution :**

In Words = one crore seventy five hundred three hundred two.

Now, The required smallest number is,

= 10002357

The required largest number is,

= 75321000

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution :**

The smallest 3-digit number with unique digits is 102

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

The largest 5 digit number with unique digits is 98765

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution :**

The smallest 3 digit number which does not change in reverse order is 101

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution :**

Given number, = 279

By reversing the number we get, = 972

**∴** Difference,

= (972 – 279)

= 693

Therefore, the difference between the number will be 693.

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution :**

Given digits are = 7, 1, 0, 5

**∴** Largest number is,

= 7510

**∴** Smallest number is,

= 1057

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.4 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** 102394 > 99887

**(ii)** 2507324 < 2517324

**(iii)** 3572014 < 10253104

**(iv)** 47983505 > 47894012

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** In ascending order,

6539542 < 8354208 < 12345678 < 63547201 < 102345694

**(ii)** In ascending order,

181888 < 190909 < 1808088 < 1808090 < 16060666

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** In descending order,

6944000 > 56943300 > 56943201 > 5695440 > 5694437

**(ii)** In descending order,

1021430 > 1020308 > 1020216 > 893425 > 893245

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.5 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution :**

Ten lakh milligrams make one kilogram.

or, 10,00,000 mg = 1 kilogram.

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution :**

Weight of 2, 00, 000 tablets

= (2, 00, 00 × 20)

= 40, 00, 000 mg

**∴** Now in grams,

= 4000000/1000000

= 4000 gm

**∴** Now in kilogram,

= 4000/1000

= 4 kilogram.

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution : **

In the given question,

Population of Sundarnagar,

= 2, 35, 471 in year 1991

2001 it was found to have increased,

= 72, 958

**∴** Population of the 2001,

= 92, 35472 + 72958)

= 308429

Therefore, the population of the city in 2001 is 308429.

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution :**

In the question,

First, second, third and final days were respectively,

= 1094, 1812, 2050 and 2751

**∴** Total tickets sold,

= (1094 + 1812 + 2050 + 2751)

= 7707

Hence, the total number of tickets sold on all the four days is 7707.

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution : **

In the given question,

One copy has = 12 pages

Everyday copies are printed = 11, 980

Pages are in all printed everyday = ?

**∴** Total pages,

= (12 × 11, 980) pages

= 143760 pages

Thus, in all 143760 pages are printed.

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution :**

In the question we get,

A machine manufactures,

= 2825 screws a day

**∴** Total screws produce in January,

= (2825 × 31)

= 87578

Therefore, it produce 87578 screws in the month of January 2006.

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution : **

In the question,

Player has so far scored = 6978 runs

Wishes to complete = 10, 00 runs

**∴** Need more runs,

= (10, 00 – 6978)

= 3022 runs

Therefore, he will need more 3022 runs.

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution :**

From the question we get,

Ravish has = Rs 78, 592

39 radio sets = Rs 1234 each

**∴** Expenditure on radio set,

= (1234 × 39) Rs

= 48126 Rs

**∴** Money Left,

= (78, 592 – 48126) Rs

= 30466 Rs

Hence, 30466 Rs will remain with him after the purchase.

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution : **

In the question,

Successful candidate registered = 5, 77, 570 votes

Rival secured = 3, 48, 685 votes

**∴** Successful candidate win by

= (577570 – 348685)

= 228885

Therefore, successful candidate win the election by 228885 votes.

**Question no – (10)**

**Solution :**

Total Shirt made,

= 40 m/2 m 15 cm

= 40/2.15

= 18 shirts

**∴** Cloth need,

= (18 × 2.15)

= 38.7 m

Therefore, the 1.3 m cloth will remaining.

**Question no – (11)**

**Solution : **

In the given question,

Vessel has 4 litre and 650 ml of curd.

each of glass = 25 ml capacity

**∴** No of glasses can it distributed

= 4 litre 650 ml/25 ml

= 4650/25 glasses

= 186 glasses

Therefore, 186 glasses can be distributed.

**Question no – (12)**

**Solution : **

1st the weight of box

= 4 kg 500 g

= 4500 g

Now, 800 kg into gram,

= (800 × 1000)

= 800000 gm

**∴** Total number of boxes can be loaded,

= 800000/4500

= 177.77

= 177 boxes

Thus, 177 boxes can be loaded in the van.

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.6 Solution**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(i)** 84 nearest tens is 80

**(ii)** 98 nearest tens is 100

**(iii)** 984 nearest tens is 980

**(iv)** 808 nearest tens is 810

**(v)** 998 nearest tens is 1000

**(vi)** 12, 096 nearest tens is12100

**(vii)** 10, 908 nearest tens is10910

**(viii)** 28, 925 nearest tens is 28930

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution :**

**(i)** 3, 985 to nearest hundred is 4000.

**(ii)** 7, 289 to nearest hundred is 7300.

**(iii)** 8, 074 to nearest hundred is 8100.

**(iv)** 14, 627 to nearest hundred is 14600.

**(v)** 28, 826 to nearest hundred is 28800.

**(vi)** 4, 20, 387 to nearest hundred is 420400.

**(vii)** 43, 68, 973 to nearest hundred is 43369000.

**(viii)** 7, 42, 898 to nearest hundred is 742900.

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution : **

**(i)** 2, 401 to nearest thousands is 2400.

**(ii)** 9, 600 to nearest thousands is 10000.

**(iii)** 4, 278 to nearest thousands is 4000.

**(iv)** 7, 832 to nearest thousands is 8000.

**(v)** 9, 567 to nearest thousands is 10000.

**(vi)** 26, 019 to nearest thousands is 26000.

**(vii)** 20, 963 to nearest thousands is 21000.

**(viii)** 4, 36, 952 to nearest thousands is 437000.

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution :**

Given numbers are,

**(i)** 964; **(ii)** 1, 049

**(iii)** 45, 634; **(iv)** 79, 085

Nearest 10 |
Nearest 100 |
Nearest 1000 |

(i) 960 |
1000 | 1000 |

(i) 1050 |
1000 | 1000 |

(iii) 45630 |
45600 | 46000 |

(iv) 79090 |
79100 | 79000 |

**Question no – (5) **

**Solution : **

**(i)** Rs 666 to nearest hundred is 700 Rs.

**(ii)** Rs 850 to nearest hundred is 900 Rs.

**(iii)** Rs 3, 428 to nearest hundred is 3400 Rs.

**(iv)** Rs 9, 080 to nearest hundred is 9100 Rs.

**(v)** 1, 265 to nearest hundred is 1300.

**(vi)** 417 m to nearest hundred is 400 m.

**(vii)** 550 cm to nearest hundred is 600 cm.

**(viii)** 2, 486 to nearest hundred is 2500 m.

**(ix)** 360 gm to nearest hundred is 400 gm.

**(x)** 940 kg to nearest hundred is 900 kg.

**(xi)** 273 l to nearest hundred is 300 l.

**(xii)** 820 mg to nearest hundred is 800 mg.

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

The numbers which are rounded off to nearest ten as 370 are,

= 365, 366, 367, 368, 369, 370, 371, 372, 373, 374

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution : **

According to the question,

Here, the smallest number is = 8500

And, the largest number is = 9000

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.7 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution :**

**(i) 730 + 998**

= 1728

= 1700 (Round off nearest 100)

**(ii) 796 – 314**

= 482

= 500 (Round off nearest 100)

**(iii) 875 – 384**

= 491

= 500 (After round off 100)

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

**(i) 12, 904 + 2, 888**

= 15792

= 1600 (Nearest 1000)

**(ii) 28, 292 – 21, 496**

= 6796

= 7000 (Nearest 1000)

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 439 + 334 + 4, 317**

= 400 + 300 + 4000

= 4700 (Round off in greatest place)

**(ii) 8, 325 – 491**

= 8000 – 500

= 7500 (Round off in greatest place)

**(iii) 1, 08, 734 – 47, 599**

= 1, 00, 000 – 50000

= 50000 (Round off in greatest place)

**(iv) 898 × 785**

= 900 × 800

= 720000 (Round off in greatest place)

**(v) 9 × 795**

= 10 × 800

= 8000 (Round off in greatest place)

**(vi) 87 × 317**

= 90 × 300

= 27000 (Round off in greatest place)

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution :**

**(i) 878 ÷ 28**

= 900 ÷ 30

= 30

Therefore, the estimated quotient will be 30.

**(ii) 745 ÷ 24**

= 700 ÷ 20

= 35

Therefore, the estimated quotient will be 35.

**(iii) 4489 ÷ 394**

= 4000 ÷ 400

= 10

Therefore, the estimated quotient will be 10.

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.8 Solution**

(1) Write the expression for each of the following statements using brackets.

Solution :

(i) Four multiplied by the sum of 13 and 7

∴ The expression is,

= 4 × (13 + 7)

(ii) Eight multiplied by the difference of four from nine.

∴ The expression is,

= 8 × (9 – 4)

(iii) Divide the difference of twenty eight and seven by 3.

∴ The expression is,

= (28 –7) ÷ 3

(iv) The sum of 3 and 7 in multiplied by the difference of twelve and eight.

∴ The expression is,

= (3 + 7) × (12 – 8)

(2) Simplify each of the following.

Solution :

(i) 124 – (12 – 2) × 9

= 124 – 10 × 9

= 124 – 90

= 34

(ii) (13 + 7) × (9 – 4) – 18

= 20 × 5 – 18

= 100 – 18

= 82

(iii) 210 – (14 – 4) × (18 + 2) – 10

= 210 – 10 × 20 – 10

= 210 – 200 – 10

= 0

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.9 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

= 7 × 109

= 763 (Simplified)

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution : **

= 6 × 112

= 945 (Simplified)

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution : **

= 9 × 105

= 672 (Simplified)

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution : **

= 17 × 109

= 1853 (Simplified)

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution : **

**= 16 × 108**

= 1728 (Simplified)

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

= 12 × 105

= 1260 (Simplified)

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution : **

= 102 × 103

= 10506 (Simplified)

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution : **

= 101 × 105

= 10605

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution : **

= 109 × 107

= 11663 (Simplified)

**Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.10 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** 33 in roman numeral

= XXXIII

**(ii)** 48 in roman numeral

= XLVIII

**(iii)** 76 in roman numeral

= LXXVI

**(iv)** 95 in roman numeral

= XCV

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** 154 in Roman numerals,

= CLIV

**(ii)** 173 in Roman numerals,

= CLXXTII

**(iii)** 248 in Roman numerals,

= CCXLVIII

**(iv)** 319 in Roman numerals,

= CCCXIX

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** 1008 in Roman numeral,

= KVIII

**(ii)** 2718 in Roman numeral,

= KKDCCVIII

**(iii)** 3906 in Roman numeral,

= KKKDCCXCIV

**(iv)** 3794 in Roman numeral,

= KKKDCCCCXCIV

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** 4201 in Roman numeral,

= IVCCI

**(ii)** 1009 in Roman numeral,

= MIX

**(iii)** 44000 in Roman numeral,

= XLIV

**(iv)** 25819 in Roman numeral,

= XXVDCCCXIX

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** XXVI in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 26

**(ii)** XXIX in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 29

**(iii)** LXXII in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 72

**(iv)** XCI in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 91

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** CIX in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 109

**(ii)** CLXXII in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 172

**(iii)** CCLIV in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 254

**(iv)** CCCXXIX in Hindu-Arabic numeral is 329

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** KXIX in Hindu-Arabic numerals is 1019

**(ii)** KDLXV in Hindu-Arabic numerals is 1565

**(iii)** KKCXXIII in Hindu-Arabic numerals is 2123

**(iv)** KKKDCXL in Hindu-Arabic numerals is 3640

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution :**

**(i)** IV CDXLIV in Hindu-Arabic numerals 4444.

**(ii)** VICKXLIX in Hindu-Arabic numerals 6949

**(iii)** IXCCCXCI in Hindu-Arabic numerals 9391

**(iv)** LXXIX in Hindu-Arabic numerals 70009

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution : **

**(i) IICCC**

= Wrong, (it is meaningless)

**(ii) KKKCCXI**

= Right

**(iii) XD**

= Wrong (it is meaningless)

**(iv) VC**

= Right

**Next Chapter Solutions : **