# Frank Learning Maths Class 5 Solutions Chapter 4

## Frank Learning Maths Class 5 Solutions Chapter 4 Multiplication

Welcome to NCTB Solution. Here with this post we are going to help 5th class students for the Solutions of Frank Learning Maths Class 5 Book, Chapter 4 Multiplication. Here students can easily find step by step solutions of all the problems for Multiplication. Here students will find solutions for Exercise 4.1, 4.2, 4.3, 4.4, 4.5 and 4.6. Exercise wise proper solutions for every problems. All the problem are solved with easily understandable methods so that all the students can understand easily. Here in this post all Mathematic solutions are based on the CBSE latest curriculum.

Multiplication Exercise 4.1 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 5621 × 7

(5621 × 7)

= 39347

Thirty-nine thousand three hundred forty-seven.

(b) 8625 × 9

(8625 × 9)

= 77625

Seventy-seven thousand six hundred twenty-five.

(c) 5678 × 63

(5678 × 63)

= 357714

Three lakh fifty-seven thousand seven hundred fourteen

(d) 6254 × 32

(6254 × 32)

= 200128

Two lakh one hundred twenty-eight.

(e) 5544 × 33

(5544 × 33)

= 182952

One lakh eighty-two thousand nine hundred fifty-two.

(f) 8765 × 42

(8765 × 42)

= 368130

Three lakh sixty-eight thousand one hundred thirty.

(g) 6789 × 761

(6789 × 761)

= 5166429

Fifty-one lakh sixty-six thousand four hundred twenty-nine.

(h) 7878 × 820

∴ (7878 × 820)

= 6459960

Sixty-four lakh fifty-nine thousand nine hundred sixty.

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) As per the question,

The cost of one toy car is = ₹4621.

The cost of 7 toys,

= 4621 × 7

= 32, 347

Therefore, the cost of such seven toys will be Rs. 32, 347

(b) According to the question,

The cost of one book is = ₹46.

The cost of 6214 such books = ?

The cost of 6214 books,

= 6214 × 46

= 285844

Hence, the cost of 6214 such books will be Rs. 285844

(c) From the question we get,

The cost of a bicycle is = ₹1562.

The cost of 322 such bicycles = ?

Cost of 322 bicycles,

= 1562 × 322

= 502964 Rs

Thus, the cost of 322 such bicycles will be Rs. 502964

(d) First, Cost for dress,

= 8 × 536

= 4,288 Rs

Second, Cost for books,

= 63 × 326

= 20,538 Rs

Third, Cost for pizza,

= 83 × 232

= 19,256 Rs

Now, Total amount,

= (4288 + 20538 + 19256)

= 44, 082 Rs

Therefore, total amount paid by Mr. Mohan is Rs. 44, 082

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 356 × 1 = 356

(b) 4765 × 0 = 0

(c) 8737 × 334 = 334 × 8737

(d) 34 × 0 × 8 = 0

(e) 448 × (53 × 1) = 448 × (1 × 53) = 23744

Multiplication Exercise 4.2 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) Given, 68 × 4000

(68 × 4000)

= 272000

(b) Given, 87 × 5000

(87 × 5000)

= 435000

(c) Given, 286 × 10000

(286 × 10000)

= 2860000

(d) Given, 324 × 80000

(324 × 80000)

= 25920000

(e) Given, 565 × 200000

(565 × 200000)

= 113000000

(f) Given, 5432 × 3000

(5432 × 3000)

= 16296000

(g) Given, 4326 × 60000

(4326 × 60000)

= 259560000

(h) Given, 121 × 1000000

(121 × 1000000)

= 121000000

Multiplication Exercise 4.3 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 18357 × 69

18357

× 69
———————-
165213

110142
———————-
1266633

(b) 55555 × 26

55555

× 26
———————-
333330

111110
———————-
1444430

(c) 60121 × 85)

60121

× 85
———————-
300605

480968
———————-
5110285

(d) 385462 × 18

385462

× 18
———————-
3083696

385462
———————-
6938316

(e) 470896 × 81

470896

× 81
———————-
470896

3767168
———————-
38142576

(f) 764897 × 52

764897

× 52
———————-
1529794

3824485
———————-
39774644

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 26732 × 562

26732

× 562
———————-
53464

160392

133660
———————-
= 15023384

(One crore fifty lakh twenty-three thousand three hundred eighty-four)

(b) 83945 × 151

83945

× 151
———————-
83945

419725

83945
———————-
= 12675695

(One crore twenty-six lakh seventy-five thousand six hundred ninety-five)

(c) 57003 × 409

57003

× 409
———————-
513027

00000

228012
———————-
= 23314227

(Two crore thirty-three lakh fourteen thousand two hundred twenty-seven)

(d) 254002 × 246

254002

× 246
———————-
1524012

1016008

508004
———————-
= 62484492

(Six crore twenty-four lakh eighty-four thousand four hundred ninety-two)

(e) 400634 × 323

400634

× 323
———————-
1201802

801268

1201902
———————-
= 129404682

(Twelve crore ninety-four lakh four thousand seven hundred eighty-two)

(f) 605035 × 86

605035

× 86
———————-
3630210

4840280
———————-
= 52033010

(Five crore twenty lakh thirty-three thousand ten)

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a)

 5 2 4 8 × 2 0 5 2 6 2 4 0 0 0 0 0 0 1 0 4 9 6 0 0 1 0 7 5 8 4 0

(b)

 1 2 0 7 4 × 2 3 7 8 4 1 8 3 6 2 2 2 0 2 4 1 4 8 0 0 2 8 6 1 5 3 8

Multiplication Exercise 4.4 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

Given, (3254 × 74)

= (13016 + 22778)

= 240796

Greatest digit. 876543

Then, (876543 – 240796)

= 635747

Question no – (2)

Solution :

According to the given question,

Carton contains = 450 soap cakes.

There are 1585 cartons in a godown

Total no. of soap cakes,

= (1585 × 450)

= (0000 + 7925 + 6340)

= 713250

Therefore, the number of soap cakes in the godown is 713250.

Question no – (3)

Solution :

We know, The greatest 5 digit number is = 99999

Here, the smallest 3 digit number is = 507

99999

× 507
————————-
699993

00000

499995
————————-
50699493

Question no – (4)

Solution :

As per the given question,

In a factory, toys produced daily = 326406

Toys can be made in 24 working days = ?

326406

× 24
————————-
1305624

652812
————————-
7833744

Therefore, 7833744 toys can be made in 24 working days.

Question no – (5)

Solution :

First, the cost of Urea,

= (175 × 356)

= 62300 Rs

Second, the cost of Phosphorus,

= (214 × 415)

= 88810 Rs

Total cost,

= 62300 + 88810

= 151110 Rs

Therefore, Surjeet Singh will spent total Rs. 151110.

Question no – (6)

Solution :

1st, For shirts,

= (3624 × 156)

= 565344 Rs

2nd, For trousers,

= (4567 × 867)

= 3959589 Rs

Now the total Amount,

= (3959589 + 565344)

= 4524933 Rs

Therefore, shopkeeper will make Rs. 4524933

Question no – (7)

Solution :

Total wheat in bag,

= (150 × 883) ….(according to the question)

= 132450 kg

65 trucks carries,

= (65 × 132450)

= 8609250

Therefore, 65 trucks can carry 8609250 kg wheat.

Question no – (8)

Solution :

Rice sold in bag,

= (214 × 38)

= 8132

Total amount the shopkeeper get,

= (8132 × 95)

= 772540

Hence, the shopkeeper will reactive Rs. 772540

Question no – (9)

Solution :

His monthly income,

= (957 × 26) …(according to the question)

= ₹24882

His annual income,

= (24882 × 12)

= ₹298584

Therefore, his annual income will be Rs. 298584

Multiplication Exercise 4.5 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) Given, 82 × 27

Nearest ten of 82 is = 80

Nearest ten of 27 is = 30

(80 × 30)

= 2400

Therefore, the product will be 2400

(b) Given, 68 × 92

Nearest ten of 68 is = 70

Nearest ten of 92 is = 90

(70 × 90)

= 6300

Hence, the product will be 6300.

(c) Given, 86 × 44

Nearest ten of 86 is = 90

Nearest ten of 44 is = 40

(90 × 40)

= 3600

Thus, the product will be 3600.

(d) Given, 44 × 88

Nearest ten of 44 is = 40

Nearest ten of 88 is = 90

(40 × 90)

= 3600

Therefore, the product will be 3600.

(e) Given, 22 × 77

Nearest ten of 22 is = 20

Nearest ten of 77 is = 70

(20 × 80)

= 1600

Therefore, the product will be 1600.

(f) Given, 17 × 154

Nearest ten of 17 is = 20

Nearest ten of 154 is = 150

(20 × 150)

= 3000

Hence, the product will be 3000.

(g) Given, 28 × 204

Nearest ten of 28 is = 30

Nearest ten of 204 is = 200

(30 × 200)

= 6000

Therefore, the product will be 6000.

(h) Given, 35 × 258

Nearest ten of 35 is = 40

Nearest ten of 258 is = 260

(40 × 260)

= 10400

Therefore, the product is 10400.

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) Given, 179 × 342

Nearest hundred of 179 is = 200

Nearest hundred of 342 is = 300

(200 × 300)

= 60000

Hence, the product will be 60000.

(b) Given, 439 × 224

Nearest hundred of 439 is = 400

Nearest hundred of 224 is = 200

(400 × 200)

= 80000

Thus, the product will be 80000.

(c) Given, 723 × 842

Nearest hundred of 723 is = 700

Nearest hundred of 842 is = 800

(700 × 800)

= 500000

Therefore, the product will be 500000

(d) Given, 543 × 369

Nearest hundred of 543 is = 500

Nearest hundred of 369 is = 400

(500 × 400)

= 200000

Thus, the product will be 200000.

(e) Given, 318 × 492

Nearest hundred of 318 is = 300

Nearest hundred of 492 is = 500

(300 × 500)

= 150000

Hence, the product will be 150000.

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) Given, 23 × 47

Rounding off 23 = 30

Rounding off 47 = 40

∴ Product,

= 30 × 40

= 1200

Therefore, the product will be 1200.

(b) Given, 88 × 48

Rounding off 88 = 90

Rounding off 48 = 40

∴ Product,

= 90 × 40

= 3600

Therefore, the product will be 3600.

(c) Given, 91 × 21

Rounding off 91 = 90

Rounding off 21 = 20

∴ Product,

= 100 × 20

= 2000

Therefore, the product will be 2000

(d) Given, Rounding off 62 = 70

Rounding off 79 = 70 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 70 × 70

= 4900

Thus, the product will be 4900.

(e) Given, 82 × 65

Rounding off 82 = 90

Rounding off 65 = 60 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 90 × 60

= 5400

Therefore, the product is 5400.

(f) Given, 34 × 154

Rounding off 34 = 40

Rounding off 154 = 150 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 40 × 150

= 6000

Thus, the product is 6000.

(g) Given, 43 × 269

Rounding off 43 = 50

Rounding off 269 = 260 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 50 × 260

= 13,000

Hence, the product will be 13,000.

(h) Given, 37 × 344

Rounding off 37 = 40

Rounding off 344 = 340 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 40 × 340

= 13,600

Therefore, the product will be 13,600

Question no – (4)

Solution :

(a) Given, 273 × 429

Rounding off 273 = 200

Rounding off 429 = 500 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 200 × 500

= 10,000

Hence, the product will be 10,000

(b) Given, 144 × 763

Rounding off 144 = 100

Rounding off 763 = 800 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 100 × 800

= 80,000

Therefore, the product will be 80,000

(c) Given, 195 × 425

Rounding off 195 = 100

Rounding off 425 = 500 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 100 × 500

= 50,000

Therefore, the product will be 50,000.

(d) Given, 342 × 777

Rounding off 342 = 300

Rounding off 777 = 800 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 300 × 800

= 240,000

Therefore, the product will be 240,000

(e) Given, 869 × 174

Rounding off 869 = 800

Rounding off 174 = 200 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 800 × 200

= 160,000

Therefore, the product is 160,000.

(f) Given, 367 × 231

Rounding off 367 = 300

Rounding off 231 = 300 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 300 × 300

= 90,000

Therefore, the product will be 90,000

(g) Given, 143 × 262

Rounding off 143 = 100

Rounding off 262 = 300 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 100 × 300

= 30,000

Hence, the product will be 30,000.

(h) Given, 289 × 999

Rounding off 289 = 200

Rounding off 999 = 1000 ….(According to question)

∴ Product,

= 200 × 1000

= 2,00,000

Therefore, the product will be 2,00,000

Question no – (5)

Solution :

(a) A bag contains = 96 kg of sugar

32 bags contains = ? kg of sugar

Real weight,

= 96 × 32

= 3072 kg

Now Rounding off 100 × 30

= 3000 kg

Therefore, Round off weight of sugar will be 3,000 kg.

(b) Aarti purchased 243 balls at the rate of = ₹18 per ball

Amount she has to pay = ?

Real Amount,

= 243 × 18

= 4374 Rs.

Now, Round off = 240 × 20

= 4800

Therefore, Round off amount she has to pay will be Rs. 4800

(c) As per the given question,

Man bought 374 kg of wheat = ₹ 24 per kg,

Amount he has to pay = ?

Real amount,

= 374 × 24

= ₹ 8,976

Round off amount,

= 370 × 20

= ₹7,400

Therefore, the amount he has to pay will be Rs. 7,400

Multiplication Exercise 4.6 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) Given, 2457 × 343

2457
× 343
————————
7371

9828 ×

7371 ×
————————
84275

Hence, the product will be 842751.

(b) Given, 28456 × 452

28456

× 452
————————
56912

142280 ×

113824 ×
————————
12862112

Thus, the product will be 12862112

(c) Given, 200967 × 129

200967

× 129
————————
1808702

401934 ×

200967 ×
————————
25924743

Hence, the product is 25924743

(d) Given, 801572 × 593

Now,

801572

× 593
————————
2404716

7214148 ×

4007860 ×
————————
475332196

Here, the product will be 475332196

(e) Given, 5689 × 1254

Now,

5689

× 1254
————————
22756

28445 ×

11378 ×

5689 ×
————————
7134006

Hence, the product will be 7134006

(f) Given, 9234 × 4568

Now,

9234

× 4568
————————
73872

55404 ×

46170 ×

36936 ×
————————
42180912

Therefore, the product will be 42180912

Previous Chapter Solution :

Updated: June 6, 2023 — 1:59 pm