# Frank Learning Maths Class 5 Solutions Chapter 5

## Frank Learning Maths Class 5 Solutions Chapter 5 Division

Welcome to NCTB Solution. Here with this post we are going to help 5th class students for the Solutions of Frank Learning Maths Class 5 Book, Chapter 5 Division. Here students can easily find step by step solutions of all the problems for Division. Here students will find solutions for Exercise 5.1, 5.2, 5.3, 5.4, 5.5, 5.6 and 5.7. Exercise wise proper solutions for every problems. All the problem are solved with easily understandable methods so that all the students can understand easily. Here in this post all Mathematic solutions are based on the CBSE latest curriculum.

Division Exercise 5.1 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 430 ÷ 5

(b) 544 ÷ 56

(c) 752 ÷ 164

(d) 2016 ÷ 9

(e) 6075 ÷ 81

(f) 8928 ÷ 93

(g) 3780 ÷ 254

(h) 2016 ÷ 329

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) We know, 1 dozen = 12

Number of objects is = 3912

Now,

Therefore, if the number of objects is 3912, there are 326 dozen.

(b) Given in the question,

3256 trees are planted in = 37 gardens.

Number of trees in each garden = ?

Now,

Therefore, there are 88 trees in each garden.

(c) Given number is, 4032

Now,

∴ Required number is 56.

Hence, 56 should be multiplied to give 4032.

(d) As per the question,

The cost of a book is = ₹ 104.

Books bought for = ₹ 8424?

Now,

Hence, 81 books can be brought for Rs. 8424.

(e) According to the given question,

The cost of 154 kg of rice is = ₹5236.

Cost of one kg of rice = ?

Now,

Therefore, the cost of one kg of rice will be Rs. 34

Division Exercise 5.2 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 250 ÷ 10

(b) 80900 ÷ 100

(c) 376000 ÷ 100

(d) 785000 ÷ 1000

(e) 24500000 ÷ 1000

(f) 900000 ÷ 10000

Question no – (2)

Solution :

 C TL L TTh Th H T 60 ÷ 10 600 ÷ 10 6 6000 ÷ 10 6 0 60000 ÷ 10 6 0 0 600000 ÷ 10 6 0 0 0 6000000 ÷ 10 6 0 0 0 0 60000000 ÷ 10 6 0 0 0 0 0

Division Exercise 5.3 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) Given, 67892 ÷ 74

Now,

The quotient = 917

The remainder = 34

(b) Given number, 54386 ÷ 86

Now,

The quotient = 632

The remainder = 34

(c) Given, 286752 ÷ 51

Now,

The quotient = 5622

The remainder = 30

(d) Given, 458432 ÷ 68

Now,

The quotient = 6741

The remainder = 44

(e) Given, 726908 ÷ 58

Now,

The quotient = 12532

The remainder = 52

(f) Given, 2947349 ÷ 36

Now,

The quotient = 81870

The remainder = 29

(g) Given, 1075602 ÷ 84

Now,

The quotient = 12804

The remainder = 66

(h) Given, 64836921 ÷ 59

Now,

The quotient = 109893

The remainder = 51

Division Exercise 5.4 Solution

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) Given, 86732 ÷ 371

Now,

The quotient = 232

The remainder = 300

(b) Given, 96753 ÷ 632

Now,

The quotient = 153

The remainder = 57

(c) Given, 876543 ÷ 423

Now,

The quotient = 2001

The remainder = 120

(d) Given, 554433 ÷ 675

Now,

The quotient = 821

The remainder = 258

(e) Given, 5028672 ÷ 252

Now,

The quotient = 1995

The remainder = 132

(f) Given, 4167620 ÷ 515

Now,

The quotient = 8092

The remainder = 240

(g) Given, 23021405 ÷ 148

Now,

The quotient = 155550

The remainder = 05

(h) Given, 35607520 ÷ 227

Now,

The quotient = 156861

The remainder = 73

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) As per the question,

Divisor = 321,

Quotient = 1234

Remainder = 46.

We know that, Divide = (Quotient × Divisor) + remainder

(1234 × 321) + 46

= 396114 + 46

= 396114 + 46

= 3,96,160

Therefore, dividend will be 3,96,160

(b) According to the question,

Dividend = 5632471

Divisor = 425?

Value of quotient and remainder = ?

Now,

Therefore, the value of Quotient is = 13, 252

and the value of Remainder is = 371

(c) In the given question,

Dividend = 4823597,

Quotient = 5008

Remainder = 893

We know that, Divisor = (Divided – remainder) ÷ Quotient

∴ Divisor,

= (4823597 – 893) ÷ 5008

= 48,22,704 ÷ 5008

= 963

Therefore, the value of the divisor will be 963

(d) From the question we get,

Dividend = 52156789,

Divisor = 235

Quotient = 221943

We know that,

Remainder = Dividend – (Quotient × Divisor)

∴ Value of the remainder,

= 52156789 – (235 × 221943)

= 52156789 – 52156605

= 184

Therefore, the value of remainder will be 184

Division Exercise 5.5 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

We know that, Divide = (Quotient × Divisor) + remainder

The number,

= (5643 × 435) + 46

= 2454705 + 46

= 2454751

Therefore, the required number will be 2454751

Question no – (2)

Solution :

As per the question,

Apples can be packed in a carton = 563

18241275 apples required pack = ?

Now,

Hence, 32,400 cartoon are required and 75 apples left.

Question no – (3)

Solution :

We know, Greatest 6 digit number = 999999

Now,

The required number,

= (999,999 – 168)

= 999,831

Therefore, the number will be 999,831

Question no – (4)

Solution :

We know, Greatest 6 digit number = 999999

Now,

The required number,

= (999,999 – 168)

= 999,831

Therefore, the number is 999,831

Question no – (5)

Solution :

Given, (3427895 + 8261439)
= 11689,334

Now,

Therefore, the Remainder is 203

Question no – (6)

Solution :

As per the given question,

Total students of a school = 856

collected paise for a relief fund = 342400

Each student contributed = ?

Now,

Hence, Each student contribute 400 Rs.

Question no – (7)

Solution :

According to the question,

Shopkeeper sold 275 bicycles Rs 4,79,875?

The cost of a bicycle = ?

Now,

Therefore, each bicycle will cost Rs 1745

Question no – (8)

Solution :

A per the question,

67 boys and 73 girls of a hostel paid mess fees equal to = ₹ 15,71,080

Each student pay = ?

Total no. of student,

= (67 + 73)

= 140

Now,

Therefore, each student will pay Rs. 11222

Question no – (9)

Solution :

According to the question,

364 microchips cost ₹ 12,57,984.

Defective microchips = 136

Cost of the remaining microchips = ?

Remaining chips,

= (364 – 136)

= 228

Now, 1257984 ÷ 228

= 551747

Hence, the cost of the remaining microchips will be 551747

Question no – (10)

Solution :

We know that, The greatest 7 digit number is = 9999999

Now,

Remainder = 705

Quotient = 13458

Question no – (11)

Solution :

As per the question,

The total consumption of vegetables in months of August, September, October and November = 47963324 kg

Vegetables is consumed per day = ?

Now,

Therefore, 39,3142 kg vegetables is consumed per day

Division Exercise 5.6 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) Given, 149 ÷ 45

Nearest ten of 149 is = 150

Nearest ten of 45 is = 50

150 ÷ 50 = 3

Hence, Quotient is = 3

(b) Given, 180 ÷ 60 = 3

Thus, Quotient is = 3

(c) Given, 400 ÷ 40 = 10

Therefore, Quotient is = 10

(d) Given, 720 ÷ 80 = 9

So, Quotient is = 9

(e) Given, 2970 ÷ 30 = 99

Hence, Quotient is = 99

(f) Given, 2880 ÷ 80 = 36

Thus, Quotient is = 36

(g) Given, 4860 ÷ 60 = 81

So, Quotient is = 81

(h) Given, 5850 ÷ 50 = 117

Therefore, Quotient is = 117

Division Exercise 5.7 Solution

Question no – (1)

Solution :

Given in the question,

5 bags of rice weight = 150 kg.

The weight of 1 bag = ?

Now,

Therefore, the weight of 1 bag is 30 kg.

Question no – (2)

Solution :

As per the question we get,

5 boxes can fit = 250 pens.

Pens fitted in = 40 such boxes

Now, Each box can fit,

= 250 ÷ 5

= 50

Total pen can fit it 40 box,

= 50 × 40

= 2000

Therefore, 2000 pens can be fitted in 40 such boxes.

Question no – (3)

Solution :

According to the question,

A water pipe can fill half of the water tank in = 2 hours.

Time will it take to fill = 5 such water tanks

Tank can be filled full in,

= 2 × 2

= 4 hour.

The total time to fill five tank,

= 4 × 5

= 20 hours.

Therefore, it will take 20 hours to fill five such water tanks.

Question no – (4)

Solution :

According to the question,

Nimit can type 16 words in = 8 seconds.

Words can he type in = 2 minutes ?

Now, He can type in 1 second,

= 16/8

= 2 word

∴ He can type in 2 minutes

= 2 × 2 word

= 2 × 60 × 2 ( We know, 1 min = 60 sec)

= 240 words

Hence, Nimit can type 240 words in 2 minutes.

Question no – (5)

Solution :

As per the question,

Weight of 15 pieces of gold is 1620 g.

How much gold pieces can have a weight of = 7560 g?

First,

Each piece weight,

= 1620/15

= 108 gram.

We can get,

= 7560/108

= 72 pieces

Therefore, 72 gold pieces can have a weight of 7560 g.

Question no – (6)

Solution :

As per the question,

The length of 6 wires is = 90 m.

Each wire length

= 90/6

= 15 m.

(a) Length of 10 wires,

= 15 × 10

= 150 m

(b) No. of wire can be made from 30 m,

= 30/15

= 2 wires can be made.

Question no – (7)

Solution :

An athlete covers 480 metres in = 8 minutes.

Distance will he cover in 20 minutes = ?

First, Athlete cover in 1 min,

= 480/8

= 60 m

Now, Athlete can cover in 20 mint,

= 60 × 20

= 1200 m

Hence, the Athlete cover 1200 m in 20 minutes.

Question no – (8)

Solution :

Given in the question,

Factory produces 82440 toys in a month of 30 days.

Toys were produced in 5 days = ?

First, Factory produces in each day,

= 82440/30

= 2748

The factory produce in 5 day

= 2748 × 5

= 13,740 toys

Therefore, 13,740 toys were produced in 5 days.

Previous Chapter Solution :

Updated: June 6, 2023 — 2:46 pm