# Mathsight Class 6 Solutions Chapter 1

Warning: Undefined array key "https://nctbsolution.com/mathsight-class-6-solutions/" in /home/862143.cloudwaysapps.com/hpawmczmfj/public_html/wp-content/plugins/wpa-seo-auto-linker/wpa-seo-auto-linker.php on line 192

## Mathsight Class 6 Solutions Chapter 1 Knowing Our Numbers

Welcome to NCTB Solutions. Here with this post we are going to help 6th class students to solve MathSight Class 6 Mathematics Book, Chapter 1, Knowing Our Numbers. Here students can easily get all the exercise questions solution for Chapter 1, Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.1, 1.2 and 1.3

Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.1 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 34,56,805

= Thirty four lakh fifty six thousand eight hundred nine .

(b) 7,77,77,777,

= Seven crore seventy corer lakh

(c) 40,05,123

= Forty lakh five thousand one hundred twenty three.

(d) 672,789

= Six lakh seventy two thousand seven hundred eighty nine .

(e) 3,443,209

= Thirty four lakh three thousand two hundred nine .

(f) 3,123,987

= Thirty one lakh twenty three thousand nine hundred eighty seven .

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 72,451

= 70000 + 2000 + 400 + 50 + 1

(b) 7,09,521

= 70000 + 9000 + 500 + 20 + 1

(c) 83,24,041

= 8000000 + 300000 + 20000 + 4000 + 40 + 1

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 1 lakh

= 1000 thousand (iv)

(b) 1 crore

= 1000 ten thousand (iii)

(c) 1 million

= 10 lakh (i)

(d) 1 thousand

= 100 tens (ii)

Question no – (4)

Solution :

 Crore M Lakh T.Th Thousand Humdred Ten One (a) 365008 3 6 5 0 0 8 (b) 4794349 4 7 9 4 3 4 9 (c) 42604509 4 2 6 0 4 5 0 9

Question no – (5)

Solution :

 B H.M. C. M. L. T.Th Th H T O (a) 450814 4 5 0 8 1 4 (b) 75928432 7 5 9 2 8 4 3 2 (c) 4000587500 4 0 0 0 5 8 7 5 0 0

Question no – (6)

Solution :

(a) 23203109

= 23203109 + 1

= 232031010

(b) 56456345

= 56456345 + 1

= 56456346

(c) 1,21,23,122

= 121,23,122 + 1

= 12123123

(d) 400587500

= 400587500 + 1

= 400587501

Question no – (7)

Solution :

(a) 60,00,000

= 60,00,000 – 1

= 599999

(b) 24,56,456

= 25,56,456 – 1

= 2556455

(c) 7,42,31,000

= 7,4231000 – 1

= 74230999

(d) 1,09,02,723

= 10902723 – 1

= 10902722

Question no – (8)

Solution :

(a) Greatest number,

= 4952,4451

Smallest number,

= 4382,4270

(b) Greatest number

= 46975,46523

∴ Smallest number

= 46452,46270

(c) Greatest number,

= 7,08,420,708,227

∴ Smallest number,

= 7,05,927,70522

Question no – (9)

Solution :

(a) 23456

(b) 103478

Question no – (10)

Solution :

(a) 85320

(b) 98540

Question no – (11)

Solution :

(a) 567981 > 567891

(b) 5,504,201 < 5,504,210

(c) 8,894,008 < 8,894,080

Question no – (12)

Solution :

(a) 53500022

(b) 48017

(c) 5049508

(d) 48707414

Question no – (13)

Solution :

(a) 74689

(b) 930541

(c) 100305

Question no – (14)

Solution :

64915228

Question no – (15)

Solution :

6 twice

= 6,6

0 thrice

= 0,0,0

1 twice

= 1,1,

Largest number = 6611000

Smallest number = 1000166

Question no – (16)

Solution :

150 million km

= 150,000,000

Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.2 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 47

= 47 + 3

= 50

(b) 778

= 778 + 2

= 780

(c) 2,634

= 2634 + 6

= 2640

(d) 48,479

= 48479 + 1

= 48480

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 230

= 230 + 10

= 240

(b) 997

=  997 + 3

= 1000

(c) 37,724

= 37724 + 6

= 37730

(d) 2,134

= 2134 + 6

= 2140

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 4,401

= 4401 + 9

= 4410

(b) 7,604

= 7604 + 6

= 7610

(c) 6,718

= 6718 + 2

= 6720

(d) 6,823

= 6823 + 7

= 6830

Question no – (4)

Solution :

(a) 75284

= 75284 + 6

= 75290

(b) 12,499

= 12499 + 1

= 12500

(c) 68,439

= 68439 + 1

= 68440

(d) 53,222

= 53222 + 8

= 53230

Question no – (5)

Solution :

(a) 2,65,148

= 2,65,148 + 2

= 2,65,150

(b) 4,72,341

= 4,72,341 + 9

= 4,72,350

(c) 8,10,388

= 8,10,388 + 2

= 3,10,390

(d) 25,98,144

= 25,98,144 + 6

= 25,98,150

Question no – (6)

Solution :

(i) 330 = 329 + 1

(ii) 330 = 331 – 1

(iii) 330 = 350 – 5

(iv) 330 = 328 + 2

(v) 330 = 324 + 6

∴ five number are  329,331,335,328,324

Question no – (7)

Solution :

(a) 362 + 482

=> 362 → 370

482 → 480

∴ Estimate difference,

= 480 + 370

= 850

Actual difference,

= 482 + 362

= 844

(b) 587 + 240 + 310

=> 587 → 590

240 → 250

310 → 300

∴ Estimate difference,

= 590 + 300 + 250

= 1140

∴ Actual difference,

= 587 + 240 + 310

= 1137

(c) 207 + 131 + 248

=>207 → 210

131 → 130

248 → 250

∴ Estimate difference,

= 210 + 130 + 250

= 590

Actual difference,

= 207 + 131 + 248

= 586

(d) 398 + 4,392

=> 398 → 400

4392 → 440

∴ Estimate difference,

= 440 + 400

= 4800

Actual difference,

= 4392 + 398

= 4790

Question no – (8)

Solution :

(a) 483 – 266

=> 483 → 480

266 → 270

∴ Estimate difference,

= 480 – 270

= 210

Actual difference,

= 483 – 266

= 217

(b) 481 – 139

=> 481 → 480

139 → 140

Estimate difference,

= 480 – 140

= 340

Actual difference,

= 481 – 139

= 342

(c) 887 – 437

=> 887 →  890

437 → 440

∴ Estimate difference,

= 890 – 440

= 450

Actual difference,

= 887 – 437

= 50

(d) 479 – 215

= 479 → 480

215 → 220

∴ Estimate difference,

= 480 – 220

= 260

Actual difference,

= 479 – 215

= 264

Question no – (9)

Solution :

(a) 13 × 27

=> 13 → 10

27 → 30

∴ 13 × 27

= 10 × 30

= 300

(b) 49 × 192

⇒ 49 → 50

= 192 → 190

∴ 49 × 192

= 190 × 50

= 9500

(c) 35 × 45

⇒ 35 → 30

45 → 40

∴ The product

= 30 × 40

= 1200

(d) 115 × 27

⇒ 115 → 110

27 → 30

∴ The product

= 110 × 30

= 3300

Question no – (10)

Solution :

Let potatoes,

= 2345 – 145

= 2280 kg.

≈ 2300 kg.

Question no – (11)

Solution :

6500 → 6518 – 18

7000 → 6851 + 149

Question no – (12)

Solution :

Three numbers are 2,80,9,3

2983 + 17 → 3000

3298 – 112 → 3000

2893 – 107 → 3000

Knowing Our Numbers Exercise 1.3 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 42

= (50 – 10) + 2

= XLII

(b) 85

= (50 + 10 + 10 + 5)

= LXXXV

(c) 1500

= (1000 + 500)

= MD

(d) 1390

= 1000 + 180 + 100 +100 + (100 – 10)

= MCCCCX

(e) 348

= 100 + 100 + 100 + (50 – 2)

= CCCLVI

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) XXVII

= 27

(b) XLVI

= 46

(c) LVIII

= 58

(d) CD

= 400

(e) CMILXV

= 65

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) LX < XC

(b) XCII > LXV

(c) XLIV < LXIV

(d) XXIV < XLV

(e) LXIX < LXXII

Question no – (4)

Solution :

MVXVX it is Meaningless.

Question no – (5)

Solution :

(a) XC + X

= 90 + 10

= 100

= C

(b) XX – X

= 20 – 10

= 10

= X

(c) LX – XL

= 60 – 40

= 20

= XX

(d) XLIV + XX

= 44 + 20

= 64

= LXII

(e) XXX – IV

= 30 – 4

= 34

= XXXIV

Question no – (6)

Solution :

(a) CCCXL

= 100 + 100 + 100 + (50 -10)

= 340

(b) CDXLV

= 400 + 40 + 5

= 445

(c) CLXVII

= 100 + 60 + 7

= 167

(d) DCCXL

= 700 + 40

= 740

(e) XCLX

= 99

Question no – (7)

Solution :

XXV

= 20 + 5

= 25

VI

= 5

MMVI

= 1000 + 1000 + 6

= 2006

∴ Date of birth = 25/05/2006

Question no – (8)

Solution :

(a) (i) IV + I

= V

(ii) III + I

= IV

(b) V – III

= II

(c) 15 → XV  [using IIII here]

Next Chapters Solution :

Updated: May 25, 2023 — 4:16 pm