**Warning**: Undefined array key "https://nctbsolution.com/frank-learning-maths-class-6-solutions/" in

**/home/862143.cloudwaysapps.com/hpawmczmfj/public_html/wp-content/plugins/wpa-seo-auto-linker/wpa-seo-auto-linker.php**on line

**192**

**Frank Learning Maths Class 6 Solutions Chapter 1 More About Numbers**

Welcome to NCTB Solution. Here with this post we are going to help 6th class students for the Solutions of Frank Learning Maths Class 6 Book, Chapter 1 More About Numbers. Here students can easily find step by step solutions of all the problems for More About Numbers. Here students will find solutions for Exercise 1.1, 1.2, 1.3 and 1.4. Exercise wise proper solutions for every problems. All the problem are solved with easily understandable methods so that all the students can understand easily. Here in this post all Mathematic solutions are based on the CBSE latest curriculum.

**More About Numbers Exercise 1.1 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** 74,632 = Seventy four thousand six hundred thirty-two

**(b)** 9,99,999 = Nine Lakh ninety-nine thousand nine hundred ninety-nine.

**(c)** 67,23,453 = Sixty-seven Lakh twenty –three thousand four hundred fifty-there.

**(d)** 8,53,69,450 = Eight crore fifty-three Lakh sixty-nine thousand four hundred fifty.

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** 753,645 = Seven hundred fifty three thousand six hundred forty-five.

**(b)** 9,834,251 = Nine million eight hundred thirty-four thousand fifty-one

**(c)** 67,345,982 = Sixty –seven million three hundred forty-five thousand nine hundred eighty – two.

**(d)** 960,054,331 = Nine hundred sixty million fifty four thousand three hundred thirty – one.

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** Four hundred seventy-three thousand fifty-five

= 473,055

**(b)** Seven crore three lakh eighty-two

= 7,0300,082

**(c)** Forty-eight million one hundred fifteen thousand seven hundred eight

= 48,115.708

**(d)** Sixty-five lakh ninety thousand ten

= 65,90,010

**(e)** Seven million seventy

= 7,000,070

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution : **

**(a) 23.764 in expanded form, **

= 2 × 10,000 + 3 × 1000 + 7 × 100 + 6 × 10 + 4

**(b) 4,03,557 in expanded form, **

= 4 × 1,00, 000 + 3 × 1000 + 5 × 100 + 5 × 10 + 7

**(c)** **24,05,804 in expanded form, **

= 24 × 1,00,000 + 5 × 1000 + 8 × 100 + 4

**(d) 5,05,05,005 in expanded form, **

= 5 × 1,00,00,000 + 5 × 1,00,000 + 5 × 1,000 + 5

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** 7 × 1,00,000 + 8 × 10,000 + 6 × 1000 + 5 × 100 + 2 × 10 + 3

= 7,86,523

**(b)** 3 × 10,00,000 + 2 × 1,00,000 + 8 × 10,000 + 5 × 1000 + 9 × 100 + 3 × 10 + 4

= 32,85,934

**(c)** 3 × 1,00,000 + 5 × 10,000

= 3,50,000

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

Given umbers |
Place Value |
Face value |
Difference |

(a) 87,652 |
80,000 | 8 | 79,992 |

(b) 54,863 |
800 | 8 | 792 |

(c) 7,38,26 |
8,000 | 8 | 7,992 |

**Question no – (7)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** How many lakhs make 1 million?

= 10 Lakhs make 1 million.

**(b)** How many lakhs make 1 crore?

= 100 Lakhs make 1 crore.

**(c)** How many thousands make a lakh?

= 100 thousand make a lakh.

**(d)** How many millions make a billion?

= 1000 million make 1 billion.

**Question no – (8)**

**Solution : **

Three are [(610 – 576) – 1] numbers between 576 and 610

**Question no – (9)**

**Solution : **

There are,

9 none – digit numbers.

90 two-digit numbers.

900 three-digit numbers

————————————————–

900000 six-digit numbers.

**Try These 1 (i) : **

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** To count the rooms of our house.

**(ii)** To count the trees of our garden.

**(iii)** To measure the length of my pencil.

**(iv)** To district chocolate amongst my brothers.

**(v)** To measure the time of my study.

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution : **

**(i)** Army personals in India.

**(ii)** Stars in the universe.

**(iii)** Arts in our locality.

**(iv)** Hairs of our family members.

**(v)** The population of China.

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution : **

The smallest natural number is ‘I’ and there always exists a greater natural number for every natural number.

Therefore, there is no greatest natural numbers.

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution : **

19 natural numbers lie between 30 and 50,

**Try These 1 (ii) : **

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** 9999999 is the greatest seven-digit numbers.]

**(b)** 1000000 is the smallest seven-digit number.

**Question no – (2)**

**Solution :**

**(a)** 1, 00, 034 **<** 1, 00, 450

**(b)** 3, 74, 96, 381 **>** 78, 65, 413

**(c)** 94, 78, 93, 502,** >** 94, 78, 93, 205

**(d)** 1, 99, 98, 464 **=** 1, 99, 98, 464

**Question no – (3)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** Given numbers, 20,585; 47,840; 20,510; 55,945; 64,800

In ascending order, 20, 510; 20585; 47,840; 55, 945; 64,

**(b)** Given numbers, 3,84,651; 98,432; 4,27,554; 3,21,157; 92,354

In ascending order, 92, 354; 98,432; 3,21,157; 3,84,651; 4,27,554

**Question no – (4)**

**Solution : **

**(a)** Given number, 45,000; 64,800; 82,500; 35,000

In descending order, 82,500; 45000; 35,000

**(b)** Given number, 9,40,09,581; 9,50,09,481; 9,05,04,518; 90,05,20,184; 9,48,10,095

In descending order, 90,05,184; 9, 050, 09481; 9,48,10,095; 9,04,09,581 ; 9,05,04,518

**Question no – (5)**

**Solution : **

The smallest one is 18659 and the greatest one is 524843

**Question no – (6)**

**Solution : **

Yes, 986785 is smaller than 1000000.

**More About Numbers Exercise 1.2 Solution**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

Digits |
Greatest number |
Smallest number |

(a) 3, 7, 8, 9 |
9873 | 3789 |

(b) 9, 4, 3, 2 |
9432 | 2349 |

(c) 5, 6, 8, 0 |
8650 | 5068 |

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

The smallest eight-digit number having four different digits is **10000023**

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution : **

The three-digit numbers using the digits 4, 5, 8 taking digit is

= 458, 548, 485, 584, 854, 845

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution : **

The greatest and smallest four-digit numbers any of the given digits is.

Digits |
Greatest number |
Smallest number |

(a) 5, 6, 7 |
7765 | 5567 |

(b) 8, 0, 5 |
8850 | 5008 |

(c) 0, 2, 4 |
4420 | 2004 |

(d) 9, 1, 3 |
9931 | 1139 |

**Question no – (5) **

**Solution : **

Largest |
Smallest |

(a) 985764 |
105234 |

(b) 876954 |
102934 |

(c) 498765 |
401235 |

(d) 987651 |
203451 |

**Question no – (6) **

**Solution : **

As we know,

The largest six-digit number is 999999

The smallest seven-digit number is 1000000

**∴**** Difference, **

= 1000000 – 999999

= 1

The required difference is 1

**Question no – (7) **

**Solution : **

The preceding five numbers in descending order are

= 100000, 999999, 999998, 999997, 999996, 999995

**Question no – (8) **

**Solution : **

The succeeding numbers in ascending order are

= 100000, 100001, 100002, 100003, 100004, 100005,

**Question no – (9) **

**Solution : **

**(a)**

3, 04, 567 = Three Lakh four thousand five hundred sixty-seven.

3, 04, 576 = Three lakh four thousand five hundred seventy-six.

3, 04, 756 = Three lakh four thousand seven hundred fifty-six.

3, 07, 456 = There lakh seven thousand four hundred fifty-six.

3, 70, 456 = Three lakh seventy thousand four hundred fifty-six.

**(b)** In Ascending order,

= 3, 04, 567 – 3, 04, 576 – 3, 07, 456 – 3, 07, 456 – 3, 70, 456

**Question no – (10) **

**Solution : **

The number and that obtained on reversing its digits are

= 8375 – 5738

= 2637

**Try These 1 (iii) :**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** 10,00,000 centimetres make one kilometer.

**(b)** 10,00,000 milligrams make one kilogram.

**(c)** 10,00,000 millimetres make one kilometer.

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

**(a) 35,000 cm into m**

= 35,000

= 350 m

**(b) 15,000 g into kg**

= 15,000g

= 15 kg

**(c) 28,000 m into km**

= 28, 000

= 28 km

**(d) 7000 mL into L**

= 7000 ml

= 7L

**(e) 56,000 mg into g**

= 56,000 mg

= 50g

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution : **

Mililitre is the correct unit to measure cough syrup.

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution : **

In a week, Sarika walked

= (900 m × 7)

= 6300 m

**Question no – (5) **

**Solution : **

The number of required 200 ml cups are

= 200/200

= 10

**Question no – (6) **

**Solution : **

Each tablet weighs 20 mg

There are 3,00,000 tablets

So, the total weight is (20 × 3,00,000) mg

= 60,00,000 mg

= (60,00,000/10,00,000) kg

= 6 kg

**More About Numbers Exercise 1.3 Solution**

**Question no – (1)**

**Solution : **

**(a) From C to A through B.**

= CB + BA

= (2170 + 1350) Km

= 3520 km.

**(b) From A to D through E.**

= AE + ED

= (1500 + 1280) km

= 2780 km.

**(c) From C to B through E and A.**

= CE + EA + AB

= (1490 + 1500 + 1350)

= 4340 km.

**(d) From A to B through E, D and C.**

= AE + ED + DC + CB

= (1500 + 1280 + 2160 + 2170) km

= 7110 km.

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

As we know that,

(Total Population) – (number of males) = (number of females)

So, 47,98,450 – 24,56,780

= 2341, 670

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution : **

As we know,

(Weight of each cylinder) × (no of cylinder) = (Total weight)

So, 18.250 kg × 15 = (18 × 15) kg + (250 × 15) gm

= 270 kg + 3750 gm

= 270 kg + 3750 kg

= 273.750 kg

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution : **

As per the rule :

(Cost of each Laptop) × (no of Laptop) = (Total cost)

So, 91,20,545) × (20)

= 24,10,900 Rupees.

**Question no – (5) **

**Solution : **

Distance Coved by the student in 1 day,

= (1 km 875m) × 2 = (1 × 2) km + (875 × 2) m

= 2 km + 1750 m

= 2 km + 1.750 km

= 3.750 km

So, Distance coved by the student in 6 days,

= (3.750 × 6) km

= 22.500 km

**Question no – (6) **

**Solution : **

Jagri’s required runs,

= (10,000 – 7890)

= 2110

∴ 2110 runs to complete 10,000 runs.

**Question no – (7) **

**Solution : **

Water tank has the capacity of 1020 litres.

Each bucket has the capacity 20 litres.

So, the number of required buckets are

= 1020/20

= 51

**∴** 51 buckets can filled from the water tank.

**Question no – (8) **

**Solution : **

The student added 196 instead of 169. to 67.394

Now, the difference is,

= – (196 – 169)

= 27

Therefore, g is answer 27 greater than the correct answer.

**Question no – (9) **

**Solution : **

Geetika multiplied 84,352 by 57 instead of 75.

So, the difference of her answer and the correct answer is =

= (84, 352 × 75) – (84, 352 × 57)

= 48, 352 (75 – 57)

= 84,352 × 12

= 1012224

**∴** Her answer is 1012224 less than the correct answer

**Question no – (10) **

**Solution : **

The dealer has 2,48,500 rupees

The total cost of purchasing coolers is

= (50 × 4500) rupees.

= 225,000 rupees

So, after purchasing coolers

= (2,48, 500 – 2,25,000)

= 23, 500 rupees will remain with him.

**Question no – (11) **

**Solution : **

The tempo has capacity to carry 900 kg

= (900 × 1000) gm

= 900000 gm

And each boxes of mangoes weight 4 kg 500 g

= [(4 × 1000) + 500] gm

= 4500 gm

**∴**** The tempo can carry, **

= 900000/4500

= 200 boxes

**Question no – (12) **

**Solution : **

For making 18 shirts the measure of the required cloth is 38 m 70 cm

= [(38 × 100) + 70] cm

= 3870 cm

So, for each shirts, the required measure of cloth is

= (3870/18) cm

= 215 cm

**Try These 1 (iv) : **

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

Number |
Rounded off to nearest 10 |

(a) 21 |
20 |

(b) 124 |
120 |

(c) 236 |
240 |

(d) 1295 |
1300 |

(e) 3015 |
3020 |

(f) 108679 |
108680 |

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

Number |
Rounded off to nearest 100 |

(a) 931 |
900 |

(b) 745 |
700 |

(c) 750 |
800 |

(d) 97 |
100 |

(e) 1056 |
1100 |

(f) 76845 |
76800 |

**Try These 1 (v) : **

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** 4672

= 5000

**(b)** 8404

= 8000

**(c)** 47,732

= 48,000

**(d)** 95,501

= 96,000

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

Round off the given numbers to the nearest tens, hundreds and thousands :

Numbers |
Approximate to Nearest |
Rounded From |

(a) 95,643 |
Tens | 95,640 |

(b) 38,956 |
Hundreds | 39,000 |

(c) 40,935 |
Thousands | 41,000 |

(d) 6,89,675 |
Ten thousands | 6,90,000 |

**More About Numbers Exercise 1.3 Solution**

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** 63 → 70

= Wrong

**(b)** 48 → 50

= Correct

**(c)** 1873 → 1800

= Wrong

**(d)** 286 → 200

= Wrong

**(e)** 49,830 → 49800

= Correct

**(f)** 6850 → 6800

= Wrong

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** 456 + 285

= 741 ≈ 700

**(b)** 794 – 312

= 482 ≈ 500

**(c)** 14,805 + 3885

= 18,690 ≈ 19,000

**(d)** 37, 646 – 21,248

= 16,398 ≈ 16000

**(e)** 64 × 85

= 5440 ≈ 5000

**(f)** 687 × 273

= 187551 ≈ 188000

**(g)** 2392 × 592

= 1,416,064 ≈ 1,400,00

**(h)** 97 ÷ 24

= 4.04 ≈ 4

**(i)** 848 ÷ 39

= 21.74 ≈ 22

**Question no – (3) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** 546 + 684 + 7316

= 8546 ≈ 8546 ≈ 8500

**(b)** 1,09,834 – 48,799

= 61,035 ≈ 6100

**(c)** 5,69,462 + 4,71,340

= 1,040802 ≈ 1,041000

**Question no – (4) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** Number of hours you spend in the school in a month.

= I spend almost 150 hours in the school in a month.

**(b)** The total number of students in your school.

= The total number of students of our school is almost

**(c)** Number of hours spent by you watching television in a week.

= I spend almost 11 hours watching television in a week

**(d)** The population of your city.

= I live in a small village the population of my village is nearly 25000.

**(e)** The number of guests invited to a small dinner party at your place.

= The number of guests is almost 200 invited to a small dinner party at my place.

**(f)** The time taken by you to answer all the questions on this page.

= I have taken almost 20 minutes to answer all the questions on this page.

**Try These 1 (vi) : **

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(a) 15 × (102 – 2)**

= 15 × 100

= 1500 ….(Simplified)

**(b) (19 + 1) ÷ (17 – 7)**

= 18 ÷ 10

= 1.8 ….(Simplified)

**(c) 63 – {63 – (63 – 63 – 63)}**

= 63 – {63 – (63 – 0)

= 63 – {63 – 63}

= 63 – 0

= 63 ….(Simplified)

**(d) [{48 + (12 × 3)} ÷ 6] – 11**

= [{48 ÷ 36} ÷ 6] – 11

= [84 ÷ 6] – 11

= 14 – 11

= 3 ….(Simplified)

**(e) 5 + 2 [19 – (4 × 3)}]**

= 5 + 2 [19 – {25 – 12}]

= 5 + 2 [19 – 13]

= 5 + 2 × 6

= 5 + 12

= 17 ….(Simplified)

**(f) 1/2 of 10 + 9 – (9 + 7) ÷ 4 – 3 × 2**

= 5 + 9 – 16 ÷ 4 – 6

= 14 – 4 – 6

= 10 – 6

= 4 ….(Simplified)

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** Divide 65 by the product of 13 and 5.

= (65 ÷ (13 × 5)}

**(b)** Divide the sum of 23 and 12 by 7.

= {(12 + 23) ÷ 7}

**(c)** Find the product of the difference of 84 and 48 and the sum of 4 and 2.

= {(84 – 48) × (4 + 2)}

**(d)** Find 1 of the difference of 101 and the 2 product of 13 and 7.

= 1/2 of {101 – (13 × 7)

**(e)** Add 10 to 5 times the difference of the product of 9 and 15 and the sum of 65 and 35.

= 10 + [5 × {(19 × 15) – (65 + 35)}]

**Try These 1 (vii) : **

**Question no – (1) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** 3 in Roman numeral,

= III

**(b)** 7 in Roman numeral,

= VII

**(c)** 15 in Roman numeral,

= XV

**(d)** 29 in Roman numeral,

= XXIX

**(e)** 38 in Roman numeral,

= XXXVIII

**(f)** 43 in Roman numeral,

= XXXXIII

**(g)** 61 in Roman numeral,

= LXI

**(h)** 95 in Roman numeral,

= VC

**(i)** 99 in Roman numeral,

= IC

**(j)** 164 in Roman numeral,

= CLXIV

**(k)** 226 in Roman numeral,

= DXXVI

**(l)** 310 in Roman numeral,

= DCX

**Question no – (2) **

**Solution : **

**(a)** XIII in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 13

**(b)** XV in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 15

**(c)** XXXI in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 31

**(d)** XXVII in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 27

**(e)** XLV in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 45

**(f)** LIV in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 54

**(g)** LX in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 60

**(h)** XC in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 90

**(i)** CLIV in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 154

**(j)** XCI in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 91

**(k)** CXI in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 111

**(l)** CLIV in Hindu-Arabic numerals,

= 154

**Next Chapter Solutions : **

Chapter 2 | Chapter 3 | Chapter 4 | Chapter 5 | Chapter 6 | Chapter 7 |

Chapter 8 | Chapter 9 | Chapter 10 | Chapter 11 | Chapter 12 | Chapter 13 |

Chapter 14 | Chapter 15 |