# Collins Maths Solutions Class 6 Chapter 1

## Collins Maths Solutions Class 6 Chapter 1 Large Numbers

Welcome to NCTB Solution. Here with this post we are going to help 6th class students for the Solutions of Collins Maths Class 6 Mathematics, Chapter 1, Large Numbers. Here students can easily find Exercise wise solution for chapter 1, Large Numbers. Students will find proper solutions for Exercise 1.1, 1.2, 1.3, 1.4, 1.5 and 1.6 Our teacher’s solved every problem with easily understandable methods so that every students can understand easily. Here in this post all the solutions are based on ICSE latest Syllabus.

Large Numbers Exercise 1.1 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 23999

= Twenty three thousand nine hundred ninety nine.

(b) 90909

= Ninety thousand nine hundred nine.

(c) 11009

= Eleven thousand nine

(d) 31108

= Thirty one thousand one hundred eight.

Question no – (2)

Question :

(a) 45, 251 < 81, 320

(b) 10,024 < 10,204

(c) 80,756 < 84,245

(d) 92,475 > 85,784

Question no – (3)

Solution :

According to the question,

Factory A has 99009 employees

Factory B has 99099 employees

Hence, 99099 is bigger number.

Therefore, B company has more number of employees.

Large Numbers Exercise 1.2 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

As we know that, successor means +1 and predecessor means -1.

(a) 2

Predecessor = 1,

Successor = 3

(b) 24,530

Predecessor 24,529,

Successor = 24,531

(c) 78,90,214

Predecessor = 78,90213,

Successor = 78,90,214

(d) 85,12,046

Predecessor = 85,12,045,

Successor = 85,12,047

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 135204

International place value systems = 135,304

Indian place value system = 135,204

(b) 9052020

International place value systems = 90,52,020

Indian place value system = 90,52,020

(c) 52147683

International place value systems = 521,412,565

Indian place value system = 52,147,683

(d) 50412565

International place value systems = 50,412,565

Indian place value system = 50,412,565

(e) 25386125

International place value systems = 25,386,125

Indian place value system = 25,3,86,125

(f) 50263050

International place value systems = 50,263,050

Indian place value system = 50,263,050

(g) 52010509

International place value systems = 52,010,509

Indian place value system = 52,010,509

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 67,495,702

= 7,00,000 and 90,000

(b) 75,50,293

= 70,00,000 and 50,000

(c) 140,849,021

= 100,000,000 and 40,000

(d) 75,95,008

= 5,00,000 and 90,000

(e) 17,003,004

= 10,000,000 and 3,000

(f) 23,45,892

= 20,00,000 and 800

(g) 6,80,36,203

= 80,00,000 and 30,000

(h) 2,35,67,890

= 2,00,00,000 and 800

Question no – (4)

Solution :

(a) Three crore seventy lakh forty thousand two hundred five

Now in Indian place value system,

= 3,70,40,205

(b) Nine crore one lakh thirty-three thousand eight hundred seven.

Now in Indian place value system

= 9,01,33,807

(c) Ninety-nine lakh forty-one thousand five hundred ninety.

Now in Indian place value system

= 99,41,590

(d) Sixty-seven lakh four.

Now in Indian place value system,

= 67,00,004

Question no – (5)

Solution :

(a) Three crore seventy lakh fifty thousand two hundred five

Now in international place value system

= 37,050,205

(b) Thirty-four million seven hundred thousand six

Now in International place value system

= 34,700,006

(c) Five million four,

Now in International place value system

= 5,000,004

Large Numbers Exercise 1.3 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 12568958 > 12560998

(b) 99999999 > 99999990

(c) 89567426 < 90050580

(d) 10000001 < 90050580

(e) 45612300 > 45632100

(f) 23578246 > 2357842

(g) 72400578 > 72450306

(h) 98765421 > 12345678

Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 4345608, 3350720, 21007891, 3052608, 72456218

Now in ascending order,

= 3052608 < 3350720 < 4345608 < 21007891 < 72456218

(b) 2000123, 20607812, 10200123, 20450012, 9999901, 1112222

Now in ascending order,

= 1112222 < 2000123 < 9999901 < 2000123 < 20450012 < 20607812

(c) 12043015, 12010214, 23015670, 10206789, 1243015

Now in ascending order,

= 1243015 < 10206789 < 12010214 < 12043015 < 23015670

(d) 70050236, 10024005, 79050510, 1000245, 70522369, 78045123

Now in ascending order,

= 1000245 < 10024005 < 70050236 < 70522369 < 78045123

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 1205679, 7856824, 5067891, 5026078, 1262187.

Now in descending order,

= 7856824 > 5067891 > 1262187 > 1262187 > 1205679

(b) 8110203, 20104712, 28902823, 20450023, 20801503, 22102183

Now in descending order,

= 8110203 > 28902823 > 22102183 > 20801503 > 20450023 > 20104712

(c) 70130114, 70130110, 70130600, 70130112, 70130350

Now in descending order,

= 70130600 > 70130350 > 70130114 > 70130112 > 70130110

(d) 31010230, 31250202, 43551012, 25020245, 31251236, 31278451

Now in descending order,

= 43551012 > 31278451 > 31251236 > 31250202 > 31010230 > 25020245

Large Numbers Exercise 1.4 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

(a) 2569868 + 2569856

2569868

+ 2569856
————————
5139724

(b) 548658 – 25689765

2568975

-548658
————————
-25141107

(c) 45689 × 29

45689

× 29
————————
411201

91378×
————————
1324981

(d) 256897 ÷ 26 Question no – (2)

Solution :

(a) 4569824 and 8756845

4569824

+ 8756845
———————-
13326669

(b) 7865489 from 10256842

10256842

– 7865489
———————-
2391353

(c) Multiply 368490 by 81

368490

× 81
——————–
368490

2947920×
——————–
2,98,47,690

(d) Given, 684321 by 95

Now, Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 3598475 and 158964

3598475

+ 8502504
———————-
121,00,979

(b) 159875 and 98753647

159875

+ 98753647
———————-
98,91,3522

Question no – (4)

Solution :

(a) 5698751 and 8502504

= (8502504 – 5698751)

= 28,03,753

(b) 46857540 and 259864754

= (259864754 – 46857540)

= 213007214

Question no – (5)

Solution :

(a) 548934 and 371

548934

371
———————
548934

3842538 ×

646802 × ×
———————
203654514

(b) 248678 and 654

248678

654
———————-
994712

1243390 ×

1492068 × ×
———————-
162635412

Question no – (6)

Solution :

(a) 357819 by 49 Quotient = 7302

Remainder = 21

(b) 2365875 by 107 Quotient = 22110

Remainder = 105

Large Numbers Exercise 1.5 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

= (12742000 – 6779000) mars

= 5963000 meter

12742000

– 6779000
———————–
5963000

Therefore, the difference between the diameter of Earth and Mars is 5963000 meter.

Question no – (2)

Solution :

Total amount savouries sold by two baker

= (186295 × 250) gm

= 4657350 gm

Or

186295

× 250
———————–
000000

9314750

37259000
———————–
46573750

Total amount of sweets sold by the baker.

= (186295 × 175) gm

= 32601625 gm

Or

186295

× 175
———————–
9314475

13040650

18629500
———————–
32601625

Question no – (3)

Solution :

The amount of water needed for 275 people for 45 days

= 275 × (4500 × 45) ml

= 275 × 202500 ml

= 55687500 ml

Thus, the amount of water needed for 275 people for 45 days is 55687500 ml.

Question no – (4)

Solution :

As per the given question,

Entrepreneur made a profit in the first year = Rs 45698641

Entrepreneur made a profit in the second year = Rs 2567894

The total profit made by him,

= (45698641 + 2567894)

= 71,377,582 Rs

Therefore, the entrepreneur will made Rs 71,377,582 in both years.

Question no – (5)

Solution :

According to the given question,

Radha purchased gold worth = Rs 86061250.

Each gram of gold is = Rs 3025

= 8661250/3025 gm

= 28450 gm

Hence, the amount of gold purchased by Radha is 28450 gm.

Large Numbers Exercise 1.6 Solution :

Question no – (1)

Solution :

 Number Nearest Ten Nearest Hundred Nearest Thousand Nearest Ten Thousand 71243 71240 71200 7100 70000 50421 50420 50400 50000 50000 21897 21900 21900 22000 20000 14630 14630 14000 15000 10000

Question no – (2)

Solution :

 SL.NO Number Nearest Lakh Nearest Ten Lakh Nearest crore (a) 9,17,43,459 91700 000 9,20,00,000 9,00,00,000 (b) 3,63,80,061 364,00,000 3,60,00,000 4,00,000,000 (c) 7,45,66,438 7,46,00,000 7,50,00,000 7,00,00,000

Question no – (3)

Solution :

(a) 786 – 421

= 800 – 400

= 400

(b) 384 + 236

= 384 → 400

= 234 → 200

= 400 → 200

= 600

(c) 28 × 41

= 28 → 30

= 41 → 40

= 30 × 40

= 1200

(d) 412 ÷ 36

= 412 → 400

= 36 → 40

= 400 ÷ 40

= 10

(e) 2378 + 5601

= 2378 → 5601

= 5608 → 3000

= 5608 → 5000

= 83000 + 5000

= 8000

(f) 89014 – 52478

= 89-14 → 90000

= 52478 → 50000

= 90000 – 500000

= 40000

(g) 129 × 387

= 129 → 100

= 387 → 400

= 100 → 400

= 40000

(h) 76 × 501

= 76 → 80

= 501 → 500

= 80 → 500

= 40000

Next Chapter Solution :

Updated: June 14, 2023 — 8:27 am